US HB5347 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 555.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 555.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of the Interior to establish a Disadvantaged Community Drinking Water Assistance Program. Under the program, Interior must provide grants to assist communities that have experienced a significant decline in quantity or quality of drinking water in obtaining or maintaining adequate quantities of water that meet drinking water quality standards. Specifically, grants must be provided to communities that are unable to meet primary drinking water quality standards or to communities with water supplies that have been lost or severely diminished due to drought conditions, groundwater overdraft conditions, or climate change conditions. Grants must benefit communities with a median household income below a certain threshold located in a city, town, or special district with a population of no more than 60,000 residents.
Title
Disadvantaged Community Drinking Water Assistance Act
Sponsors
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 555. |
2020-12-18 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2020-12-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-671, Part I. |
2020-02-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-12-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2019-12-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Air quality
Building construction
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Rural conditions and development
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Building construction
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Rural conditions and development
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply