US HB535 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-4)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PFAS Action Act of 2019 This bill requires the Environmental Protection Agency to designate all perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances as hazardous substances within one year of enactment of this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PFAS Action Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]
Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-26HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2019-09-26HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-13HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
2019-01-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB638 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1599)
HB2500 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Received in the Senate.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Conference held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback