US HB5352 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the tax deduction for the expenses of elementary and secondary school teachers from $250 to $500.
Title
Supporting America’s Teachers Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-12-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB878 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5377 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2510 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3178 (Related) 2020-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5377 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2510 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3178 (Related) 2020-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5352/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5352/BILLS-116hr5352ih.pdf |