US HB5374 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 401.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 401.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish and support advanced geothermal research and development programs at the Department of Energy, and for other purposes.
Title
Advanced Geothermal Research and Development Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 401. |
2020-09-11 | House | Committee on Education and Labor discharged. |
2020-09-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-500, Part I. |
2020-02-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-19 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-12-19 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Earth sciences
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Higher education
Hydrology and hydrography
International organizations and cooperation
Land use and conservation
Mining
Oil and gas
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Earth sciences
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Higher education
Hydrology and hydrography
International organizations and cooperation
Land use and conservation
Mining
Oil and gas
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization