US HB5390 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a mechanism for coastal states to participate in a Regional Ocean Partnership with one or more other coastal states that share a common ocean or coastal area. Specifically, the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration may designate a partnership as a Regional Ocean Partnership if it (1) is established to coordinate the interstate management of coastal resources; (2) focuses on the environmental issues affecting the ocean and coastal areas of the coastal states participating in the partnership; (3) complements existing state coastal and ocean management efforts on an interstate scale, focusing on shared regional priorities; (4) does not have a regulatory function; and (5) is not duplicative of an existing Regional Ocean Partnership. A Regional Ocean Partnership may use provided federal funds to award grants and enter into contracts for certain purposes, including to monitor the water quality and living resources of multistate ocean and coastal ecosystems.
Title
Regional Ocean Partnership Act
Sponsors
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] |
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] |
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2020-11-17 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-12-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2166 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 396.
Subjects
Alabama
Aquatic ecology
Atlantic Ocean
California
Congressional oversight
Connecticut
Delaware
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental education
Environmental health
Florida
Government studies and investigations
Gulf of Mexico
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
Louisiana
Maine
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Maryland
Massachusetts
Mississippi
New Hampshire
New Jersey
New York State
Oregon
Pacific Ocean
Public lands and natural resources
Regional and metropolitan planning
Research administration and funding
Rhode Island
State and local government operations
Texas
Vermont
Virginia
Washington State
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Aquatic ecology
Atlantic Ocean
California
Congressional oversight
Connecticut
Delaware
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental education
Environmental health
Florida
Government studies and investigations
Gulf of Mexico
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
Louisiana
Maine
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Maryland
Massachusetts
Mississippi
New Hampshire
New Jersey
New York State
Oregon
Pacific Ocean
Public lands and natural resources
Regional and metropolitan planning
Research administration and funding
Rhode Island
State and local government operations
Texas
Vermont
Virginia
Washington State
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5390/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5390/BILLS-116hr5390ih.pdf |