US HB540 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 87.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 770 Ayrault Road in Fairport, New York, as the "Louise and Bob Slaughter Post Office". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 770 Ayrault Road in Fairport, New York, as the "Louise and Bob Slaughter Post Office."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 770 Ayrault Road in Fairport, New York, as the "Louise and Bob Slaughter Post Office".

Sponsors

Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY]
Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]

Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 142 (Y: 414 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 87.
2019-05-15SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
2019-05-15SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-04-03SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-04-02HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-04-02HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 7 (Roll no. 142). (text: CR H2969)
2019-04-02HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2972)
2019-04-02HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-04-02HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 540.
2019-04-02HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2969-2970)
2019-04-02HouseMr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-03-26HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2019-03-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-01-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback