US HB5469 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To address mental health issues for youth, particularly youth of color, and for other purposes.
Title
Pursuing Equity in Mental Health Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] |
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5012-5013) |
2020-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5469. |
2020-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5012-5014) |
2020-09-29 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 452. |
2020-09-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-552. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-12-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-12-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1109 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1122 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4388 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SB1122 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4388 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Child health
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Family relationships
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Internet and video services
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Licensing and registrations
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Minority health
Performance measurement
Telephone and wireless communication
Child health
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Family relationships
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Internet and video services
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Licensing and registrations
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Minority health
Performance measurement
Telephone and wireless communication