US HB5474 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates approximately 289,000 acres of Forest Service land comprising the Shawnee National Forest in Illinois as the Shawnee Wilderness and as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System.
Title
Shawnee Wilderness Designation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3075 (Same As) 2019-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Illinois
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Illinois
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5474/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5474/BILLS-116hr5474ih.pdf |