US HB5486 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture, when distributing funds for broadband deployment, to give priority to projects for small ports and projects on cropland or ranchland. In addition, a recipient of such rural broadband buildout funding must provide certain geolocation information as a condition of receiving the funds.
Title
Broadband Internet for Small Ports Act
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] |
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2019-12-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2385 (Same As) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
Agricultural practices and innovations
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Farmland
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Internet and video services
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Farmland
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Internet and video services
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5486/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5486/BILLS-116hr5486ih.pdf |