US HB550 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 201-102)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the obligation or expenditure of federal funds for any use of military force in or against Iran unless Congress has either declared war or enacted specific statutory authorization for such use. An exception is made for a presidential exercise of power to introduce Armed Forces into hostilities (or situations where imminent involvement in hostilities is clearly indicated) when there is a national emergency created by an attack upon the United States. The bill further states that no prior authorizations of military force may be construed to authorize the use of military force against Iran, and it repeals the Authorization for Use of Military Force Against Iraq Resolution of 2002.
Title
Merchant Mariners of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - On motion to concur in the Senate amendment with amendment specified in section 4(b) of H.Res. 811 RC# 34 (Y: 236 N: 166 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - On motion to concur in the Senate amendment with amendment specified in section 4(a) of H.Res. 811 RC# 33 (Y: 228 N: 175 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - On motion to concur in the Senate amendment with amendment specified in section 4(a) of H.Res. 811 RC# 33 (Y: 228 N: 175 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment. |
2020-01-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-30 | House | On motion to concur in the Senate amendment with amendment specified in section 4(b) of H.Res. 811 Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 236 - 166 (Roll no. 34). (text: CR H726-727) |
2020-01-30 | House | On motion to concur in the Senate amendment with amendment specified in section 4(a) of H.Res. 811 Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 175 (Roll no. 33). (text: CR H717-718) |
2020-01-30 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Engel motion that the House concur in the Senate amendment with an amendment specified in section 4(b) of H. Res. 811, the Chair put the question on adoption of the motion and announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Engel demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion until a time to be announced. |
2020-01-30 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2020-01-30 | House | Pursuant to H.Res. 811, the House proceeded with one hour of debate on the motion that the House concur in the Senate amendment with an amendment specified in section 4(b). (consideration: CR H726-737, H738-739) |
2020-01-30 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Engel motion that the House concur in the Senate amendment with an amendment specified in section 4(a) of H.Res. 811, the Chair put the question on adoption of the motion and announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Engel demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion until a time to be announced. |
2020-01-30 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2020-01-30 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to H.Res. 811, the question shall be divided among the two House amendments. Pursuant to section 3(a) of H.Res. 811, the portion of the divided question comprising the amendments specified in section 4(a) of H.Res. 811 shall be considered first. Each amendment specified in section 4 shall be debatable for one hour. |
2020-01-30 | House | Pursuant to H.Res. 811, Mr. Engel was recognized to move that the House concur in the Senate amendment to H.R. 550 with amendments specified in section 4 of H.Res. 811. (consideration: CR H717-726, H737-738) |
2019-12-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1273 Amendment SA 1273 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1273 Amendment SA 1273 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Murkowski. (consideration: CR S7232-7233; text: CR S7232-7233) In the nature of a substitute. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7232-7233) |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7807-7808) |
2019-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 550. |
2019-09-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7807-7810) |
2019-09-19 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-06-25 | House | Motion to place bill on Consensus Calendar filed by Mr. Garamendi. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB133 (Same As) 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB5671 (Related) 2020-03-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-125. (TXT | PDF)
HR811 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2456 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB5543 (Related) 2020-01-07 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3159 (Related) 2020-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB5671 (Related) 2020-03-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-125. (TXT | PDF)
HR811 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2456 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB5543 (Related) 2020-01-07 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3159 (Related) 2020-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Congressional tributes
Defense spending
International affairs
Iran
Iraq
Marine and inland water transportation
Middle East
Military history
Military operations and strategy
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Transportation employees
War and emergency powers
Congressional oversight
Congressional tributes
Defense spending
International affairs
Iran
Iraq
Marine and inland water transportation
Middle East
Military history
Military operations and strategy
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Transportation employees
War and emergency powers