US HB5514 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to establish a program to provide loans to implement cost-effective energy efficiency measures, and for other purposes.
Title
Community Energy Savings Program Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-12-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-12-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2382 (Same As) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3452 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3452 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy prices
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Public utilities and utility rates
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
State and local government operations
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy prices
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Public utilities and utility rates
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5514/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5514/BILLS-116hr5514ih.pdf |