US HB5517 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes (1) a professional exchange program between the United States and India with a focus on the legacies of Martin Luther King Jr. and Mohandas Gandhi, (2) a development training initiative based on principles of nonviolence, and (3) a foundation to address development priorities in India. Specifically, the bill establishes a professional exchange program comprised of both an annual educational forum for scholars from the United States and India, as well as an undergraduate, graduate, and post-graduate student exchange for students in the United States and India. The bill also establishes a professional development training initiative on conflict resolution tools based on the principles of nonviolence. Further, the bill establishes the United States-India Gandhi-King Development Foundation to identify development priorities in India (e.g., pollution and climate change, education, and tuberculosis) and administer competitively awarded grants to nongovernmental entities to address those priorities.
Title
Gandhi-King Scholarly Exchange Initiative Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] |
Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] |
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6079-6081) |
2020-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5517. |
2020-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6079-6082) |
2020-12-03 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation. |
2019-12-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-12-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Air quality
Asia
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civics education
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Environmental health
Foreign aid and international relief
Higher education
Historic sites and heritage areas
Human rights
India
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
Policy sciences
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Water quality
Water use and supply
Women's rights
Asia
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civics education
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Environmental health
Foreign aid and international relief
Higher education
Historic sites and heritage areas
Human rights
India
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
Policy sciences
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Water quality
Water use and supply
Women's rights