US HB5581 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 332.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 332.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides various protections for covered individuals subject to secondary or deferred inspections when seeking admission into the United States. Covered individuals include U.S. nationals, lawful permanent residents, aliens in possession of a visa, and refugees. The Department of Homeland Security shall ensure that a covered individual subject to secondary or deferred inspection has a meaningful opportunity to consult with counsel and certain related parties, such as a relative, within an hour of the start of the secondary inspection and as necessary during the inspection process. The counsel and related party shall be allowed to advocate on behalf of the covered individual, including by providing evidence and information to the examining immigration officer. A lawful permanent resident subject to secondary or deferred inspection may not abandon lawful permanent resident status until the individual has had a reasonable opportunity to seek advice from counsel, unless the individual voluntarily and knowingly waives in writing this opportunity to seek counsel's advice.
Title
Access to Counsel Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 332. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee on Homeland Security discharged. |
2020-03-05 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-412, Part I. |
2020-02-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Discharged. |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2219 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2486 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment.
HB2486 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Border security and unlawful immigration
Detention of persons
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Lawyers and legal services
Border security and unlawful immigration
Detention of persons
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Lawyers and legal services