US HB559 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Became Public Law No: 116-24. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Became Public Law No: 116-24. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grants Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands (CNMI) Resident status to certain aliens who have resided continuously and lawfully in the CNMI since November 28, 2009. An individual with such status shall be (1) authorized to work in the CNMI; (2) issued travel documentation; and (3) inadmissible to the United States at any port of entry outside of the CNMI, with the exception of Guam in certain instances. To qualify for CNMI Resident status, an alien must meet various requirements, such as having (1) been lawfully present in the CNMI on the date of this bill's enactment or on December 31, 2018; and (2) resided continuously and lawfully in CNMI from November 28, 2009, through this bill's enactment.
Title
Northern Mariana Islands Long-Term Legal Residents Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-24. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-06-25 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-06-25 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4195) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2019-06-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-06-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4201-4202) |
2019-06-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 559. |
2019-06-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4201-4203) |
2019-06-03 | House | Mr. Case moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB560 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Northern Mariana Islands
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Northern Mariana Islands