US HB5598 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 556.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 556.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Withdraws approximately 234,328 acres of federal land and waters in a specified area in the Rainy River Watershed of Superior National Forest in Minnesota from entry, appropriation, and disposal under the public land laws; location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and operation of the mineral leasing, mineral materials, and geothermal leasing laws. The area is adjacent to the Boundary Waters Canoe Area Wilderness and the Boundary Waters Canoe Area Wilderness Mining Protection Area. Land or interest in land within such area that is acquired by the United States shall be immediately withdrawn in accordance with this bill. The Forest Service is authorized to permit the removal of sand, granite, iron ore, and taconite from national forest system lands within such area if the removal is not detrimental to the water quality, air quality, and health of forest habitat within the Rainy River Watershed.
Title
Boundary Waters Wilderness Protection and Pollution Prevention Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 556. |
2020-12-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-672. |
2020-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 16. |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Air quality
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Mining
Minnesota
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Water quality
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Mining
Minnesota
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Water quality
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection