US HB560 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands (CNMI) Resident status to certain otherwise qualifying aliens who do not meet a current requirement of having resided continuously and lawfully in the Northern Mariana Islands from November 28, 2009, through June 25, 2019. Specifically an alien shall be exempt from this residency requirement if the alien was admitted as a Commonwealth Only Transitional Worker during FY2015 and every subsequent fiscal year before July 24, 2018. To qualify for CNMI Resident status, the alien must meet other existing requirements related to such status. An individual who has resided in the Northern Mariana Islands as an investor and is currently residing as a Northern Mariana Islands-only nonimmigrant may receive CNMI Resident status upon meeting other requirements.
Title
Northern Mariana Islands Residents Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2020-02-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1203) |
2020-02-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 560. |
2020-02-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1203-1204) |
2020-02-26 | House | Mr. Neguse moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-01-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 296. |
2020-01-10 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2020-01-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-373, Part I. |
2019-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB559 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Became Public Law No: 116-24. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Northern Mariana Islands
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Northern Mariana Islands