US HB5622 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PERSIST Against MST Act Purposefully Expanding and Reinforcing the Statutes we Insist Support our Troops Against Military Sexual Trauma Act
Title
PERSIST Against MST Act Purposefully Expanding and Reinforcing the Statutes we Insist Support our Troops Against Military Sexual Trauma Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2018-04-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5622/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5622/BILLS-115hr5622ih.pdf |