US HB563 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-10)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DD-214 Modernization Act This bill directs the Department of Defense to modify the Certificate of Release or Discharge from Active Duty (DD Form 214) to include a block in which a member of the Armed Forces may provide an email address by which the member may be contacted after discharge or release from active duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DD-214 Modernization Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1237 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB2500 (Related) 2019-07-12 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2500.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback