US HB565 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes Portuguese nationals eligible for E-1 and E-2 nonimmigrant visas if the government of Portugal provides similar nonimmigrant status to U.S. nationals. An E-1 visa is for individuals entering the United States to engage in international trade, while an E-2 visa is for individuals investing a substantial amount of capital in the United States. Both are limited to nationals from countries that have a treaty of commerce and navigation with the United States.
Title
AMIGOS Act Advancing Mutual Interests and Growing Our Success Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9189) |
2019-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 565. |
2019-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9189-9191) |
2019-12-03 | House | Mr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-22 | House | Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Discharged. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2926 (Same As) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Europe
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Portugal
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Portugal
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports