US HB570 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the maximum prison term for a stalking offense, if the victim is under 18 years of age.
Title
Combat Online Predators Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB134 (Same As) 2020-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-249.
HB1585 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 66.
HR281 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2843 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6569)
SB2920 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 308.
HB1585 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 66.
HR281 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2843 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6569)
SB2920 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 308.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local government operations
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/570/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr570/BILLS-116hr570ih.pdf |