US HB5700 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses projects to increase the resiliency of federal-aid highways and bridges on and off the National Highway System. Specifically, the bill allows states to use up to 15% of funds apportioned under the national highway performance program for projects to mitigate the risk of recurring damage or the cost of future repairs from extreme weather, flooding, and other natural disasters on infrastructure that is part of the National Highway System; provides for a maximum federal cost-share of up to 100% for these projects; and authorizes emergency relief funds to be used to pay for these projects, including removing debris from rivers, creeks, streams, and ditches, raising roadway grades, deepening channels to prevent flooding, improving drainage, and stabilizing slopes.
Title
Resilient Highways Act
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1909 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2302 (Related) 2020-01-08 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-200.
HB7248 (Related) 2020-06-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SB2302 (Related) 2020-01-08 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-200.
HB7248 (Related) 2020-06-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Air quality
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Floods and storm protection
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Natural disasters
Performance measurement
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Floods and storm protection
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Natural disasters
Performance measurement
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5700/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5700/BILLS-116hr5700ih.pdf |