US HB5707 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
START Act Sexual Trauma Response and Treatment Act
Title
START Act Sexual Trauma Response and Treatment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2018-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5707/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5707/BILLS-115hr5707ih.pdf |