US HB5713 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sustaining Healthcare Integrity and Fair Treatment Act of 2016 This bill amends titles XVIII (Medicare) and XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act, among other Acts, to modify provisions related to long-term care hospital (LTCH) payments under Medicare. (Sec. 101) The bill amends the Medicare, Medicaid, and SCHIP Extension Act of 2007 to revise the applicability of certain Medicare payment rules exempting LTCHs from negative payment adjustments for admissions from certain co-located hospitals beyond specified thresholds. These rules shall apply for an additional period beginning on October 1, 2016. (Sec. 102) In addition, the bill amends the Pathway for SGR Reform Act of 2013 to expand to all LTCHs the application of a payment rule that requires the exclusion of certain patients for purposes of calculating length of stay. Under current law, the payment rule applies only to a hospital that was classified as an LTCH as of a specified date. (Sec. 103) The bill removes certain hospitals specializing in neoplastic disease from their classification as LTCHs for purposes of Medicare payment. (Sec. 104) With specified exceptions, current law applies certain payment limits to inpatient services for LTCHs that do not meet specified discharge requirements. The bill: (1) establishes a new temporary exception to these limits for certain spinal cord specialty hospitals, and (2) expands an existing temporary exception with respect to certain discharges involving severe wounds. (Sec. 201) Current law allows the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to impose a temporary moratorium on the enrollment of new providers under Medicare, Medicaid, or the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP) if necessary to combat fraud, waste, or abuse. With specified exceptions, the bill prohibits payment under these programs to new providers in areas subject to such temporary moratorium.
Title
Sustaining Healthcare Integrity and Fair Treatment Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Roll Calls
2016-09-21 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 420 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 420 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 420 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 3 (Roll no. 530). (text: CR 09/20/2016 H5685-5687) |
2016-09-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5739-5740) |
2016-09-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-09-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5713. |
2016-09-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5685-5688) |
2016-09-20 | House | Mr. Tiberi moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-09-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 594. |
2016-09-20 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2016-09-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-761, Part I. |
2016-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2016-07-11 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2016-07-11 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2016-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-07-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Cancer
Cell biology and embryology
Health
Hospital care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medicare
Neurological disorders
Cell biology and embryology
Health
Hospital care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medicare
Neurological disorders