US HB5745 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 23, United States Code, to establish a competitive grant program to repair, improve, rehabilitate, or replace bridges to improve the safety, efficiency, and reliability of the movement of people and freight over bridge crossings, and for other purposes.
Title
Bridge Investment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2302 (Related) 2020-01-08 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-200.
SB2310 (Related) 2019-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2310 (Related) 2019-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Accidents
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Atmospheric science and weather
Congressional oversight
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Indian lands and resources rights
Natural disasters
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Atmospheric science and weather
Congressional oversight
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Indian lands and resources rights
Natural disasters
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5745/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5745/BILLS-116hr5745ih.pdf |