US HB5756 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 522.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 522.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the provision of disaster assistance for critical services to solid waste management, stormwater management, public housing, transportation infrastructure, and medical care. Such assistance is also extended to any major disaster in Puerto Rico or the U.S. Virgin Islands subsequent to Hurricane Irma or Hurricane Maria on or before September 30, 2022.
Title
Resiliency Enhancement Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 522. |
2020-12-09 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-637. |
2020-02-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Caribbean area
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Floods and storm protection
Health programs administration and funding
Housing and community development funding
Infrastructure development
Natural disasters
Public housing
Puerto Rico
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation programs funding
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Floods and storm protection
Health programs administration and funding
Housing and community development funding
Infrastructure development
Natural disasters
Public housing
Puerto Rico
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation programs funding
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands