US HB5758 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the energy conservation standard for ceiling fans. Specifically, it sets forth energy efficiency standards for electricity used by large-diameter ceiling fans manufactured on or after January 21, 2020. It also exempts such fans from certain requirements under the rule titled Energy Conservation Program: Energy Conservation Standards for Ceiling Fans.
Title
Ceiling Fan Improvement Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-09 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 396 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2020-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 2 (Roll no. 241). (text: CR H7074) |
2020-12-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7093) |
2020-12-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5758. |
2020-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7074-7076) |
2020-12-09 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-12-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 511. |
2020-12-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-626. |
2020-07-15 | House | Subcommittee on Energy Discharged. |
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Energy
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Product safety and quality
Department of Energy
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Product safety and quality