US HB5780 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency (CISA) to increase outreach and engagement with owners and operators of critical infrastructure. Specifically, the bill directs CISA to maintain a clearinghouse where owners and operators of critical infrastructure and other stakeholders may access security guidance, best practices, and other voluntary content developed by CISA. CISA must also issue a strategy to foster stakeholder outreach and operational engagement and establish a pilot program whereby law enforcement agencies and government officials may be trained by protective security advisors on carrying out vulnerability and risk assessments of facilities.
Title
Safe Communities Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-09-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5078-5079) |
2020-09-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5780. |
2020-09-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5078-5080) |
2020-09-30 | House | Ms. Underwood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-08-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 382. |
2020-08-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-476. |
2020-02-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5667 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Performance measurement
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Performance measurement
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development