US HB5785 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the exclusion from gross income of income attributable to the discharge of indebtedness on a principal residence.
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent the exclusion from gross income of discharges of qualified principal residence indebtedness.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2788 (Related) 2013-07-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2994 (Related) 2013-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3856 (Related) 2014-01-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1187 (Related) 2013-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2994 (Related) 2013-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3856 (Related) 2014-01-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1187 (Related) 2013-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5785/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5785/BILLS-113hr5785ih.pdf |