US HB5843 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide the Inspector General of the Department of Veterans Affairs testimonial subpoena authority, and for other purposes.
Title
Strengthening Oversight for Veterans Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3177 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Justice
Department of Veterans Affairs
Evidence and witnesses
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Congressional oversight
Department of Justice
Department of Veterans Affairs
Evidence and witnesses
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5843/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5843/BILLS-116hr5843ih.pdf |