US HB586 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 81-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies immigration law provisions relating to unaccompanied alien minors and to asylum seekers. For certain unaccompanied inadmissible alien children, generally those not at risk of being trafficking victims nor having a fear of persecution, the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) shall repatriate the child. Currently, only inadmissible unaccompanied aliens from neighboring countries are subject to repatriation, and DHS has discretion whether to repatriate. When HHS releases an unaccompanied child to an individual, it shall provide DHS with certain information about that individual, including Social Security number and immigration status. The bill amends the definition of "credible fear of persecution" to require that such fear can be established by statements that are more probable than not. The bill also imposes certain rules relating to credible fear interviews, including requirements for recordings and interpreters. If an alien is granted asylum because of fear of persecution in a country, the alien is deemed to have renounced asylum status by returning to that country, if there has been no change in the country's conditions. DHS may waive such renunciation if there was a compelling reason for the return. The bill expands the definition of a frivolous asylum application to include an application so insufficient in substance that it is clear that it was filed to delay removal or seek employment authorization. Any individual who knowingly and willfully makes materially false statements or uses fraudulent documents in asylum-related proceedings shall be fined or imprisoned up to 10 years, or both.
Title
Fix the Immigration Loopholes Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB517 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB574 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3857 (Related) 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3940 (Related) 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3855 (Related) 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB574 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3857 (Related) 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3940 (Related) 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3855 (Related) 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child safety and welfare
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Evidence and witnesses
Family relationships
Federal preemption
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
International law and treaties
Lawyers and legal services
Licensing and registrations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
State and local government operations
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child safety and welfare
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Evidence and witnesses
Family relationships
Federal preemption
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
International law and treaties
Lawyers and legal services
Licensing and registrations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/586/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr586/BILLS-116hr586ih.pdf |