US HB5861 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To address the impact of climate change on agriculture, and for other purposes.
Title
Agriculture Resilience Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] |
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3981 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5607 (Related) 2020-01-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB2337 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5607 (Related) 2020-01-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB2337 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural education
Agricultural insurance
Agricultural marketing and promotion
Agricultural practices and innovations
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agricultural research
Agriculture and food
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Department of Agriculture
Ecology
Education programs funding
Electric power generation and transmission
Elementary and secondary education
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Farmland
Food assistance and relief
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Horticulture and plants
Income tax credits
Income tax exclusion
Land use and conservation
Livestock
Meat
Medical research
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Nutrition and diet
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Rural conditions and development
Small business
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural education
Agricultural insurance
Agricultural marketing and promotion
Agricultural practices and innovations
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agricultural research
Agriculture and food
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Department of Agriculture
Ecology
Education programs funding
Electric power generation and transmission
Elementary and secondary education
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Farmland
Food assistance and relief
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Horticulture and plants
Income tax credits
Income tax exclusion
Land use and conservation
Livestock
Meat
Medical research
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Nutrition and diet
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Rural conditions and development
Small business
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5861/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5861/BILLS-116hr5861ih.pdf |