US HB5865 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To advance technologies for carbon capture, utilization, and storage, and for other purposes.
Title
CCUS Innovation Act Carbon Capture, Utilization, and Storage Innovation Act
Sponsors
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1166 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB383 (Related) 2019-05-13 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-38.
SB383 (Related) 2019-05-13 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-38.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Higher education
Income tax credits
Infrastructure development
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Research administration and funding
State and local government operations
Technology transfer and commercialization
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Higher education
Income tax credits
Infrastructure development
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Research administration and funding
State and local government operations
Technology transfer and commercialization
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5865/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5865/BILLS-116hr5865ih.pdf |