US HB5901 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 10, United States Code, to permit the Secretary of the Army to produce, treat, manage, and use natural gas located under Fort Knox, Kentucky, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend title 10, United States Code, to permit the Secretary of the Army to produce, treat, manage, and use natural gas located under Fort Knox, Kentucky, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2018-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2018-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Kentucky
Military facilities and property
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Oil and gas
Public contracts and procurement
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Kentucky
Military facilities and property
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Oil and gas
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5901/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5901/BILLS-115hr5901ih.pdf |