US HB5901 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-03 - Became Public Law No: 116-194. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-03 - Became Public Law No: 116-194. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the General Services Administration (GSA) to establish an Information Technology Modernization Centers of Excellence Program to facilitate the adoption of modern technology by executive agencies. The GSA shall (1) coordinate with the Department of Homeland Security in establishing the program to ensure that the technology, tools, and frameworks facilitated for executive agencies by the program provide sufficient cybersecurity and maintain the integrity, confidentiality, and availability of federal information; and (2) report to Congress.
Title
Information Technology Modernization Centers of Excellence Program Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-194. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-03 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-11-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7044) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2020-09-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5072) |
2020-09-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5901. |
2020-09-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5072-5073) |
2020-09-30 | House | Mr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4200 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 570.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
General Services Administration
Government operations and politics
Infrastructure development
Public-private cooperation
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
General Services Administration
Government operations and politics
Infrastructure development
Public-private cooperation