US HB5909 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Justice to award grants for state and local correctional facilities to provide clinical services for people with serious mental illness who need post-release mental health services.
Title
Crisis Stabilization and Community Reentry Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2690 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6094-6095)
SB3312 (Related) 2020-12-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-281.
SB3312 (Related) 2020-12-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-281.
Subjects
Community life and organization
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Drug therapy
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medical education
Mental health
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Drug therapy
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medical education
Mental health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5909/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5909/BILLS-116hr5909ih.pdf |