US HB5912 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes incentive payments incurred for expedited completion of certain federally financed airport development projects an allowable project cost standard.
Title
Expedited Delivery of Airport Infrastructure Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2020-10-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-10-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5190-5191) |
2020-10-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5912. |
2020-10-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5190-5191) |
2020-10-01 | House | Mr. Carbajal moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-07-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 372. |
2020-07-29 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-464. |
2020-02-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3958 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 637.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Public contracts and procurement
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Public contracts and procurement
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding