US HB5914 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to expand the definition of "crude oil" for purposes of the excise tax on petroleum and petroleum products to include any bitumen or bituminous mixture, any oil derived from a bitumen or bituminous mixture (tar sands), and any oil derived from kerogen-bearing sources (oil shale). The bill also authorizes the Department of the Treasury to classify as crude oil or as a petroleum product subject to such tax any fuel feedstock or finished fuel product transported by pipeline, vessel, railcar, or tanker truck if such classification is consistent with the definition of oil under the Oil Pollution Act of 1990 and such fuel feedstock or finished fuel product is produced in sufficient commercial quantities as to pose a significant risk of hazard in the event of a discharge.
Title
Tar Sands Tax Loophole Elimination Act
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3315 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7781 (Related) 2020-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
HB8411 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB7781 (Related) 2020-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
HB8411 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of the Treasury
Motor fuels
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
Department of the Treasury
Motor fuels
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5914/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5914/BILLS-116hr5914ih.pdf |