US HB5919 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the General Services Administration (GSA) to enter into a cooperative agreement with the National Children's Museum with respect to the museum's occupancy of a specified space in the Ronald Reagan Building and International Trade Center. Among other things, the agreement must require the GSA to provide the rent so long as it owns or controls the space.
Title
National Children's Museum Act
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] |
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] |
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2020-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5853) |
2020-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5919. |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5853-5854) |
2020-11-17 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 468. |
2020-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-570. |
2020-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
District of Columbia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Lighting, heating, cooling
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public-private cooperation
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Lighting, heating, cooling
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public-private cooperation