US HB592 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy and Medically Underserved Areas Enhancement Act Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to cover pharmacist services.
Title
Pharmacy and Medically Underserved Areas Enhancement Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB314 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/592/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr592/BILLS-114hr592ih.pdf |