US HB5921 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PFAS Registry Act
Title
PFAS Registry Act
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
SB2719 (Same As) 2018-04-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2719 (Same As) 2018-04-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5921/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5921/BILLS-115hr5921ih.pdf |