US HB5923 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Walnut Grove Land Exchange Act
Title
Walnut Grove Land Exchange Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-12 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 394 (Y: 379 N: 3 NV: 46 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7897) |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
2018-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 3 (Roll no. 394). (text: CR H8129) |
2018-09-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8157) |
2018-09-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5923. |
2018-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8129-8130) |
2018-09-12 | House | Mr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 715. |
2018-09-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-922. |
2018-07-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-07-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-18 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-07-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-06-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3224 (Related) 2018-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.