US HB5929 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
United States Virgin Islands Small Business Contracting Assistance Act of 2018
Title
United States Virgin Islands Small Business Contracting Assistance Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2018-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5178 (Related) 2018-04-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 481.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5929/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5929/BILLS-115hr5929ih.pdf |