US HB5929 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires an issuer of securities to disclose information related to expenditures for political activities. Specifically, issuers must disclose quarterly any such expenditure, including by identifying any candidate the expenditure was made in relation to and any trade association or other tax exempt organization that received dues or other payments that may be used for political activities. Annually, issuers must report on expenditures for political activities made in the previous year over $10,000 and information related to anticipated expenditures for the next year. The Government Accountability Office must report on the effectiveness of the Securities and Exchange Commission's oversight of these reporting and disclosure requirements.
Title
Shareholder Political Transparency Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 517. |
2020-12-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-632. |
2020-02-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 25. |
2020-02-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2020-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4491 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1630 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1630 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Business expenses
Business records
Congressional oversight
Finance and financial sector
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government information and archives
Political parties and affiliation
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Tax-exempt organizations
Business records
Congressional oversight
Finance and financial sector
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government information and archives
Political parties and affiliation
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Tax-exempt organizations