US HB5953 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to waive certain debts owed to the United States related to disaster assistance provided to an individual or household. Specifically, FEMA must waive a debt owed to the United States related to disaster assistance provided to an individual or household if such assistance (1) was distributed based on an error by FEMA and such debt is construed as a hardship, and (2) is subject to a claim or legal action. FEMA must report to Congress on (1) actions that it will take to reduce the error rate, and (2) the internal processes used to make decisions regarding the distribution of federal disaster assistance to individuals and households and any changes made to such processes.
Title
Preventing Disaster Revictimization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5856) |
2020-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5953. |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5856-5858) |
2020-11-17 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 475. |
2020-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-577. |
2020-02-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Debt collection
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Debt collection
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Residential rehabilitation and home repair