US HB596 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Crimea Annexation Non-recognition Act t The bill prohibits any federal agency from taking any action or extending any assistance that recognizes or implies recognition of Russia's sovereignty over Crimea, its airspace, or its territorial waters. The President may waive such prohibitions on a case-by-case basis if such a waiver is vital to U.S. national security interests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimea Annexation Non-recognition Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 122 (Y: 427 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2019-03-12HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2019-03-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-03-12HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 427 - 1 (Roll no. 122). (text: CR H2660)
2019-03-12HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2675)
2019-03-12HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-03-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 596.
2019-03-12HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2660-2662)
2019-03-12HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules,.
2019-03-07HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-01-16HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback