US HB5968 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Services to Allow New Destinations for Tourism Act or STAND for Tourism Act - Amends the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 to authorize the Commissioner of the U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), upon request, to enter into agreements with persons for the CBP to provide additional customs and immigration services at Customs ports of entry. Requires such persons to pay a fee to reimburse CBP for such services.
Title
Services to Allow New Destinations for Tourism Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2012-06-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5964 (Related) 2012-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
SB3279 (Related) 2012-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB3279 (Related) 2012-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/5968/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr5968/BILLS-112hr5968ih.pdf |