US HB5974 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Veterans Affairs Creation of On-Site Treatment Systems Affording Veterans Improvements and Numerous General Safety Enhancements Act VA COST SAVINGS Enhancements Act This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to install and operate an on-site regulated medical waste treatment system at each VA facility that would benefit from such a system's cost savings.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs Creation of On-Site Treatment Systems Affording Veterans Improvements and Numerous General Safety Enhancements Act VA COST SAVINGS Enhancements Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] |
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7144) |
2018-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5974. |
2018-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7144-7145) |
2018-07-24 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 672. |
2018-07-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-869. |
2018-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2018-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |