US HB5975 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Puerto Rico Economic Empowerment Act of 2018
Title
Puerto Rico Economic Empowerment Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] |
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2873 (Same As) 2018-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2429 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5178 (Related) 2018-04-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 481.
SB3256 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4319 (Related) 2017-11-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1366 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2056 (Related) 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
SB154 (Related) 2017-08-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 194.
SB484 (Related) 2017-09-12 - Held at the desk.
SB526 (Related) 2018-12-20 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-452.
HB2429 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5178 (Related) 2018-04-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 481.
SB3256 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4319 (Related) 2017-11-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1366 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2056 (Related) 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
SB154 (Related) 2017-08-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 194.
SB484 (Related) 2017-09-12 - Held at the desk.
SB526 (Related) 2018-12-20 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-452.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5975/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5975/BILLS-115hr5975ih.pdf |