US HB5995 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-30)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Major Richard Star Act This bill provides that a combat-disabled uniformed services retiree with fewer than 20 years of creditable service may concurrently receive, without reduction veterans' disability compensation, and retired pay or combat-related special compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Major Richard Star Act

Sponsors

Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX]
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY]
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]
Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]
Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. James Baird [R-IN]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC]
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
2020-02-27HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-02-27HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-02-27HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB333 (Related) 2019-02-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
HB5060 (Related) 2019-12-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB208 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB3393 (Related) 2020-03-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback