US HB6009 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the Office of the Ombudsman, within the Department of Labor, for the Energy Employees Occupational Illness Compensation Program (which compensates current and former employees of the Department of Energy who are diagnosed with specified employment-related illnesses) until October 28, 2025. Currently, the authority for the office expires on October 28, 2020.
Title
Nuclear Workers’ Ombudsman Extension Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7852 (Related) 2020-07-29 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4363 (Related) 2020-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4363 (Related) 2020-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Energy
Department of Labor
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Labor and employment
Radiation
Radioactive wastes and releases
Worker safety and health
Department of Energy
Department of Labor
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Labor and employment
Radiation
Radioactive wastes and releases
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6009/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6009/BILLS-116hr6009ih.pdf |